CITY HOSPITAL NHS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To respond, wholly or partly, to requests for medical equipment forwards or departments. To maintain an information desk, conveying or directing out patients to their consultants location.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 November 1963: Standard registration
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Working name)
- DUDLEY ROAD HOSPITAL AND ST CHAD'S CANCER RESEARCH UNIT LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF ST CHAD'S HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ST CHAD'S CANCER CARE UNIT (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Mary Whalley | Chair |
|
||||||
PAMELA ANN EMERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE ALKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.78k | £2.82k | £523 | £19 | £186 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.86k | £4.72k | £2.87k | £1.83k | £24.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2024 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2024 | 729 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION RULES ADOPTED MARCH 1954 AS AMENDED 18TH MARCH 1988 AND 7TH DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL(S) AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
SMETHWICK AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O MISS JUDITH WHALLEY
LIFFORD HALL
TUNNEL LANE
KINGS NORTON
BIRMINGHAM
B30 3JN
- Phone:
- 01214591222
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window