Linked charities THE RANDOLL AND GENERAL CHARITIES
Charity Number: 219435
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 8 JULY 1879 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 3 FEBRUARY 1911 AND 3 NOVEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ANCIENT TOWNSHIP OF HENLEY-IN-ARDEN
Registration history
- 08 April 1965 : Standard registration
- 22 July 1997 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.