The Royal Mid-Surrey Benevolent Fund

Charity Number: 219440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The fund makes charitable payments to former staff members and their dependents

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • The Royal Mid-Surrey Benevolent Fund (Working name)
  • ROYAL MID-SURREY GOLF CLUB STAFF BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID LANG Chair 01 December 1985
None on record
ALISON MOSS Trustee 09 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £250 £251 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £14.45k £9.83k £7.07k £532 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE SECRETARY
ROYAL MID SURREY GOLF CLUB
OLD DEER PARK
TWICKENHAM ROAD
RICHMOND, SURREY
TW9 2SB
Phone:
02089401894