Register of Charities - The Charity Commission RASHLEY'S CHARITY
Charity number: 253490-5
Removed charity
Governing document
DEED DATED 6 OCTOBER 1884 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 19 DECEMBER 1924, 25 APRIL 1939 AND 22 JULY 1975
Charitable objects
FOR MAINTAINING A SETTLED MINISTER, OR TOARDS THE COST AND EXPENSES OF MAINTAINING AN EVANGELIST OR EVANGELISTS TO SUPPLY THE PULPIT AT THE SAID MEETING HOUSE OR CHAPEL AT EAST END
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF LYMINGTON AND BOLDRE
Registration history
- 01 September 1967: Standard registration
- 26 March 1996: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.