ADELAIDE LITTEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objects of the Charity are: (a) to relieve members of the Order who are in need, hardship or distress; (b) to provide and maintain residential homes for the use of such members; (c) to relieve or provide residential homes for dependants of members; (d) to relieve former members and their dependants as per (c); (e) to further other charitable purposes as Trustees determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 May 1970: Standard registration
- ADELAIDE LITTEN TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Ann Robertshaw | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary O'Neill | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Frances Karn | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Langdon-Bassett | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|||||
MELANIE JANE HOOPER | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Gail Amelia Green | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Elizabeth Malone | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.95k | £69.97k | £88.44k | £109.43k | £104.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.10k | £98.89k | £60.06k | £88.09k | £174.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 February 2023 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 February 2023 | 304 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 July 2022 | 450 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 July 2022 | 450 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE MEMBERS OF THE ORDER WHO ARE IN NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (B) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RESIDENTIAL HOMES REST HOMES HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF SUCH MEMBERS AS AFORESAID. (C) TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH MEMBERS AS AFORESAID AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RESIDENTIAL HOMES REST HOMES HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF SUCH DEPENDANTS. (D) TO RELIEVE AS AFORESAID FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ORDER AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. (E) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME PROVIDED THAT IN DETERMINING SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSULT WITH THE ORDER
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 PEMBRIDGE GARDENS
LONDON
W2 4EF
- Phone:
- 020 7229 2368
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window