CARMARTHENSHIRE BLIND SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN ADDITION TO THE ABOVE WE PROVIDE A WEEKLY RESOURCE CENTRE, AND DROP IN CENTRE AT LLANELLI, WHICH IS OPEN TO ALL REGISTERED MEMBERS FROM THE ENTIRE COUNTY, WHICH INCLUDES COMPUTER FACILITIES WITH DOLPHIN SOFTWARE PACKAGES AND FULL CCTV AND DOCUMENT READERS.. HOWEVER, AT THE MOMENT WE ARE UNABLE TO PROVIDE TRAINING FACILITIES. BUT THE EQUIPMENT IS AVAILABLE FOR DEMONSTRATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

13 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 28 June 1963: Standard registration
- 06 August 2024: Funds received from 1049001 AMMANFORD TALKING NEWSPAPERS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYN JAMES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jason Paul Bartlett | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Daryl Evans | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ray Cooke | Trustee | 01 April 2000 |
|
|
||||
John Lynne Griffiths | Trustee | 01 April 1997 |
|
|||||
MARGARET DAVIES | Trustee | 12 March 1990 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GILLIAN GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARVA ADELE MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ROBERT DOWNING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALUN WYN GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEULWEN ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DELYTH ARMSTRONG | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.11k | £50.56k | £284.89k | £38.72k | £129.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.48k | £41.91k | £25.26k | £31.68k | £41.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2025 | 419 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ANCIENT SOCIETY FOUNDED IN 1860 REGISTERED IN ACCORDANCE WITH NATIONAL ASSISTANCE ACT 1948 GOVERNED BY CONSTITUTION DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMEDED 2008 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND WELL BEING OF ALL VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE, BOTH BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED, THROUGHOUT THE COUNTY OF CARMARTHENSHIRE, IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE DECIDED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE TRUSTEES OF THE SOCIETY
Area of benefit
THE FORMER COUNTY OF CARMARTHENSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 TALYWERN
LLANGENNECH
LLANELLI
SA14 8UQ
- Phone:
- 01554821306
- Email:
- ray.cooke48@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window