THE ARCHDEACON DUCAT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief to clergy in financial need in the archdeaconary of Berkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bracknell Forest
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 14 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Rt Revd Olivia Josephine Graham | Chair | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
The Venerable Stephen James Pullin | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.49k | £2.56k | £2.65k | £2.74k | £3.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.28k | £0 | £700 | £265 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 02 APRIL 1937
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE PAID TO THE ARCHDEACON OF BERKSHIRE TO BE APPLIED BY HIM AT HIS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION PRIVATELY AMONG CLERGY OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WITH SMALL INCOMES OR WHO ARE IN NEED OF TEMPORARY ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
ARCHDEACONARY OF BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Birinus House
Englefield Road
Theale
READING
RG7 5AS
- Phone:
- 01865 208275
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window