E W KING MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide 8 one bedroom bungalows for the old & elderly people of Coggeshall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 16 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EVELYN RUTKIN | Chair | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Anna Cornell | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Roy Day | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER HENRY MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.51k | £33.11k | £31.13k | £31.51k | £35.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.90k | £8.46k | £17.66k | £53.44k | £11.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2019
(These accounts |
24 September 2020 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 25TH OCTOBER 1932 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 23RD MARCH 1954
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PEOPLE OF GOOD CHARACTER
Area of benefit
COGGESHALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
E W KING & CO LTD
MONKS FARM
COGGESHALL ROAD
KELVEDON
COLCHESTER
CO5 9PG
- Phone:
- 01376570000
- Email:
- les.day@kingsseeds.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window