Accounts and annual returns THE CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON AND THE GREEN CHARITY

Charity number: 219610
Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 March 2021 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required