Register of Charities - The Charity Commission CENTENARY FUND IN CONNEXION WITH THE LONDON GROCERS AND TEA DEALERS

Charity Number: 253672-1
Removed charity
Governing document
RULES AMENDED 6 JULY 1948 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 13 JANUARY 1964 AND 21 DECEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE BONA FIDE MEMBERS OF ONE OF THE TRADES DEFINED IN RULE 13 OR WERE DEPENDENT UPON A DECEASED BONA FIDE MEMBER
Area of benefit
LONDON
Registration history
  • 06 September 1967: Standard registration
  • 05 April 2000: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of