Financial history LAND FORMING PART OF KING GEORGE V PARK, WORDSLEY, BRIERLEY HILL

Charity Number: 219684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £89.25k £76.95k £91.14k £86.84k £91.69k
Total expenditure £89.25k £76.95k £91.14k £86.84k £91.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A