PETER HARRIS ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 219687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide the use of two almshouses in the Brierley Hill Area for residents who are not less than 65 years of age and who, except in special circumstances are inhabitants of the Borough of Dudley.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,182
Total expenditure: £9,578

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 June 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE PETER HARRIS TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Churches Housing Association of Dudley and District Limited Trustee 13 May 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.81k £1.88k £2.01k £153 £7.18k
Total expenditure £1.14k £1.94k £2.09k £30.40k £9.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Brindley House
North Street
DUDLEY
West Midlands
DY2 7DT
Phone:
01384 456465
Website:

No information available