SIM INTERNATIONAL (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Missionary Society, promoting mission in the UK, sending and receiving short and long term personnel to and from Africa, Asia, South America, Middle East and Europe. Receiving Support funds for the Missionaries and also seeking funding for varied ministries and projects with which they are involved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£4,259,984
Donations and legacies | £4.19m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £61.08k | |
Other | £9.59k |
Total expenditure:
£4,576,208
Raising funds | £17.18k | |
Charitable activities | £4.56m | |
Other | £0 |
£58,274 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £17.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.56m |
People

22 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
144 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- Benin
- Bolivia
- Botswana
- Burkina Faso
- Ethiopia
- France
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Namibia
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Peru
- Scotland
- Senegal
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Thailand
- United States
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- AEF (Working name)
- AFRICA EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- AFRICA EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP (SAGM) (Working name)
- AFRICA EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- SIM (Working name)
- SIM UK (Working name)
- SUDAN INTERIOR MISSION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ana Selby | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Carolyn Susan Reid | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bennett CHANDRAN CHANDRASEKAR | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Brian Thompson | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Newman | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|||||
YOSEPH MENGISTU WOLDEGEBREAL | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Jonny Dyer | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Nigel Robert John Younge | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.14m | £4.35m | £4.25m | £4.42m | £4.26m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.45m | £4.29m | £4.03m | £4.22m | £4.58m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £111.55k | £4.30m | £4.23m | £4.36m | £4.19m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.95m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £53.94k | £46.64k | £18.76k | £50.90k | £61.08k | |
|
Income - Other | £23.51k | £6.57k | £4.83k | £9.77k | £9.59k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £111.55k | £166.60k | £77.73k | £201.54k | £34.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.79m | £4.14m | £4.02m | £4.20m | £4.56m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £94.65k | £153.75k | £18.42k | £16.83k | £17.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.40k | £20.00k | £24.01k | £19.50k | £19.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £561.71k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.00m | £20.72k | £546.75k | £756.35k | £622.59k | |
|
Long-term investments | £728.77k | £914.91k | £960.41k | £1.40m | £986.57k | |
|
Other assets | £3.01m | £4.35m | £4.06m | £3.55m | £4.12m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£74.82k | -£60.35k | -£42.62k | -£5.85k | -£1.42k | |
|
Total liabilities | £462.35k | £415.30k | £409.68k | £419.63k | £698.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 August 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 August 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH SEPTEMBER 1958 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1984, 13TH MAY 1988, 22ND SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 7TH MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP AND ENCOURAGE INTEREST IN CHRISTIAN MISSIONS; TO TRAIN AND SEND FORTH MISSIONARIES TO AFRICA AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS MAY BE DETERMINED BY THE COMPANY; TO PREACH THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST WITH THE AIM OF ESTABLISHING CHURCHES WHICH ARE SELF-GOV ERNING, SELF-SUPPORTING AND SELF-PROPAGATING; TO RECEIVE AND ACCOUNT FOR REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY AND FUNDS HEREAFTER GIVEN FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE WORK; TO RECEIVE AND FORWARD FUNDS SO RECEIVED. (SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Trust Court
Histon
CAMBRIDGE
CB24 9PW
- Phone:
- 01223 788288
- Email:
- info@sim.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window