ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIRRAL AND CHESTER BRANCH

Charity Number: 219766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROMOTE THE WORK & OBJECTIVES OF THE NATIONAL SOCIETY - TO PROMOTE KINDNESS AND TO PREVENT OR SUPPRESS CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, BY ALL LAWFUL MEANS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE NATIONAL SOCIETY AND BRANCH IN PLACE AT ANY TIME AND WITHIN THE RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO US. TO RAISE FUNDS TOWARDS OPERATING COSTS AND TO CARRY OUT LOCAL ANIMAL WELFARE WORK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA WIRRAL AND CHESTER BRANCH (Working name)
  • RSPCA WIRRAL & CHESTER BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Heath Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Christina Edwards Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Chris Clayton Trustee 14 June 2021
None on record
Eileen Burke Trustee 07 June 2018
None on record
Anne Carter Trustee 07 June 2018
None on record
Pauline Marchal Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record
Alan Milne Trustee 08 July 2014
None on record
MARGARET SHILLIDAY Trustee
None on record
KEITH CROWDEN Trustee
None on record
JENNY GODWIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £294.33k £507.49k £382.83k £315.27k £542.22k
Total expenditure £359.26k £378.48k £395.14k £390.32k £417.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.01k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £386.17k N/A N/A £397.37k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £13.08k N/A N/A £37.75k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £104.75k N/A N/A £101.76k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £717 N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A £2.78k N/A N/A £5.33k
Income - Legacies N/A £263.71k N/A N/A £247.63k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £377.66k N/A N/A £412.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £815 N/A N/A £4.80k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.25k N/A N/A £5.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £1 N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A £762.08k N/A N/A £662.51k
Long-term investments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A £265.24k N/A N/A £417.39k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A £12.38k N/A N/A £27.20k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 13 AUGUST 1982.
Charitable objects
FUNDS TO BE APPLIED IN FURTHERANCE OF THE WORK OF THE WIRRAL BRANCH OF THE RSPCA AT (1) ITS DOGS HOME AT CROSS LANE, WALLASEY, AND (2) ITS CATS' SHELTER AND ANIMAL CLINIC AT LONGLAND ROAD, WALLASEY, AND THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE SAID PROPERTIES OR EITHER OF THEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 12 November 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
R S P C A
32 CROSS LANE
WALLASEY
CH45 8RH
Phone:
01516386318