Accounts and annual returns HUNTINGFIELD TOWN ESTATE CHARITY

Charity number: 219774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required