BIRMINGHAM FELLOWSHIP OF THE HANDICAPPED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide social amenities by the way of monthly club nights, outings, holidays etc for physically handicapped adults of Birmingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 21 November 1963: Standard registration
- B F H (Working name)
- THE FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS SPICER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW CHARLES TOOGOOD | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR TED BIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN RICHARD BARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN PENDREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.04k | £1.73k | £2.85k | £1.19k | £1.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.25k | £5.57k | £1.71k | £2.54k | £2.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 15 SEPTEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED 29 APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS AND HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND TO ENSURE THAT MEMBERS ARE AWARE OF ALL OTHER SERVICES PROVIDED FOR PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Linked charities
- 21 November 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 JIGGINS LANE
BIRMINGHAM
B32 3LA
- Phone:
- 01214769655
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window