CHARITY OF HARRIS ABRAHAMSON DECEASED

Charity number: 219852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Benefits only Diskin Great Israel Orphanage, Jerusalem.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £9,440
Total expenditure: £13,473

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHARITY OF HARRIS ABRAHAMSON (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN ALEXANDER OLDRIDGE Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record
Jacqueline Lucas Johnson Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.14k £9.38k £9.11k £9.09k £9.44k
Total expenditure £16.29k £15.75k £13.32k £12.78k £13.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 09 April 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 25 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRIDGE MCFARLAND
19 SOUTH ST. MARYS GATE
GRIMSBY
DN31 1JE
Phone:
01472311711
Website:

No information available