B'NAI B'RITH LEO BAECK (LONDON) LODGE TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants in respect of individuals and organisations supporting education and training and give financial support to needy jewish persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.46k | £144.96k | £164.65k | £19.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26m | £29.56k | £871.35k | £76.20k | £27.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 July 2022 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 July 2022 | 532 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 22 July 2022 | 532 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16TH JANUARY 1953
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS THE PROMOTION OF THE HIGH IDEALS AND MORAL PRINCIPLES TAUGHT BY THE JEWISH RELIGION THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SPIRIT OF SUCH IDEALS AND PRINCIPLES AS AFORESAID AND THE MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT BY FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OR OTHERWISE OF NECESSITOUS MEMBERS OF THE B'NAI B'RITH LEO BAECK (LONDON) LODGE AND OTHER NECESSITOUS PERSONS PROFESSING THE JEWISH RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window