Accounts and annual returns THE ENTERTAINMENT AGENTS' ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 219878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 15 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 June 2022 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required