TAVISTOCK REPERTORY GUARANTORS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tavistock Repertory Guarantors Ltd. exists to promote, maintain, improve, disseminate and advance education of the public, particularly in the production of educational plays, and other stage presentations and the encouragement of the dramatic arts and other arts, including the arts of drama, mime, dance, singing and music. The company trades as the Tower Theatre Company.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
123 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Ibbotson | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Tuerk | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ley | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ann Burbidge | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Judith Chalk | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN NICHOLAS LEY | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS PAUL INSLEY | Trustee | 19 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.72k | £96.45k | £178.31k | £427.76k | £455.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.26k | £176.65k | £225.14k | £306.95k | £284.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.09k | £29.22k | £9.21k | £9.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 1952. as amended on 14 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION, IMPROVEMENT, MAINTENANCE AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS.- SEE CLAUSE 3 OF COMPANY'S MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tower Theatre Co
16 Northwold Road
LONDON
N16 7HR
- Phone:
- 02073531700
- Email:
- info@towertheatre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window