KITCHINGS GENERAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide eligible Southrey widows with a pension To provide grants to relieve hardship, generally or individually to people residing in the Parish of Bardney, Southrey, Tupholme or Bucknall. This by making grants of money or providing or paying for items, services or facilities Advancement of Education, by making grants to Bardney & Bucknall towards the cost of provision for schools/pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 06 November 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY PACEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Katie East | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pacey | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren John Wilkinson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Hayes | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Armstrong | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE LEE | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR K HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
|||||
BARRY PERCIVAL | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.77k | £29.33k | £30.14k | £30.81k | £33.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.36k | £26.09k | £26.68k | £39.46k | £26.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 NOVEMBER 1975 AND SCHEME OF 31 MAY 1987 as amended on 24 Jul 2019 as amended on 24 Jul 2019 as amended on 19 Jan 2023 as amended on 19 Jan 2023 as amended on 19 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION. 2. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BARDNEY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OF FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BARDNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 ABBEY ROAD
BARDNEY
LINCOLN
LN3 5XA
- Phone:
- 01526398505
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window