DARWEN DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 219963
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 05 September 1963: Standard registration
- 10 November 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1880 AS AMENDED 24 FEBRUARY 1948 AND 22 FEBRUARY 1949
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SKILLED NURSING FOR PERSONS IN THEIR OWN HOMES. FREE NURSING CARE IS GIVEN IN NECESSITIOUS CASES. ALSO TO PROVIDE A PHYSIOTHERAPY CLINIC, HOLIDAYS FOR CONVALESCENTS AND A CHIROPODY SERVICE FOR ELDERLOY AND DISABLED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 18 MARCH 1910
Charitable objects
ENDOWMENT FUND FOR THE DARWEN DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 05 September 1963 : Standard registration
- 10 November 1997 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.