ESTATE CHARITY OF SIR CHRISTOPHER NEVILE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Receives the income from the Nevile and Summers funds and distributes as outlined below.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 February 1964: Standard registration
- AUBOURN CHARITY (Working name)
- SIR CHRISTOPHER NEVILE / SUMMERS CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Gabriel Anne Mary Hughes | Chair | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Stentiford | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Rachel Rocks | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Plackett-Smith | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Mosedale | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
HON SECRETARY MRS PATRICIA ANN WOODMAN Mrs | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £999 | £1.06k | £1.01k | £1.05k | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.27k | £252 | £1.25k | £862 | £1.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26 NOVEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20/10/2014
Charitable objects
RELIEF IN NEED IN THE PARISHES OF AUBOURN, HADDINGTON AND THURLBY. THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGES
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF AUBOURN HADDINGTON AND THURLBY
Linked charities
- 11 February 1964 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD VICARAGE
CHURCH ROAD
AUBOURN
LINCOLN
LN5 9FB
- Phone:
- 01522788236
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window