GRAYS BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 219975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious outreach into local community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £73,936
Total expenditure: £109,324

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Thurrock

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • GRAYS BAPTIST TABERNACLE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Leroy Anthony Ashley Chair 01 November 2022
None on record
George Kabia Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Abosede Rachael Akinlawon Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Robert Ohene-Adjei Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Leon Ansong Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
ROBERT JOHN KENSELL Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
HUBERT HENRY HUTCHINSON Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
DAVID ISLWYN FRANKS Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA ELIZABETH STEPHENSON Trustee
None on record
SUSAN DOREEN LIVERMORE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £65.11k £55.79k £57.57k £66.94k £73.94k
Total expenditure £37.38k £37.91k £53.05k £57.57k £109.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 21 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 21 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 December 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 December 2021 46 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Culford Road
GRAYS
RM16 2SS
Phone:
01375370112
Website:

graysbaptistchurch.org.uk