CLAIRE WAND FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing grants for research and further education for doctors working in General Practise
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DAVID SILVER | Chair | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Vanessa Lee-Millais | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Onyinye Okonkwo | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr RJ Walshaw | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr NICHOLAS SILVER | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.56k | £22.24k | £19.48k | £23.10k | £12.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.76k | £27.52k | £19.19k | £20.85k | £24.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH MARCH, 1953 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 23 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF FURTHER EDUCATION OF MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS WHO ARE PREDOMINANTLY ENGAGED IN GENERAL PRATICE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Medical Association
BMA House
Tavistock Square
London
WC1H 9JP
- Phone:
- 02073836409
- Email:
- clairewandfund@bma.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window