Trustees THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE YEOVIL HOSPITALS
Charity number: 220038

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annette Parker | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Ebdon | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Henderson | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Wardell | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Hayward | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Davis-Brown | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Walkington | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Baker | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JILL STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET SPURR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YVONNE COWLING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.