BABINGTON'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of persons resident in the Parish of Cossington, Leicestershire who are in need, hardship or distress or for further education, or for the general or individual benefit of the inhabitants of the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 12 June 1963: Standard registration
- REV JOHN BABINGTON'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN ELIZABETH MCCAGUE | Chair | 18 October 2011 |
|
|||||
Richard Plant | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Natalie Hammond | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Webb | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janette Matthews | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
David Mumford MBE | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.30k | £45.47k | £47.02k | £51.76k | £51.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.43k | £40.45k | £33.26k | £38.51k | £100.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 7 DECEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
(1)TO LET THE PROPERTIES BELONGING TO THE CHARITY TO PERSONS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER TO BE IN FINANCIAL NEED, AT LESS THAN MARKET VALUE. (2)TO MAINTAIN THE PROPERTIES. (3)SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENT OF THE EXPENSES AFORESAID:- (A)IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF COSSINGTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. (1)THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS. (2)IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANT RELIEF TO PERSONS OTHERWISE ELIGIBLE THEREFOR WHO ARE RESIDENT IMMEDIATELY OUTSIDE THE SAID PARISH BUT IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES OUGHT NEVERTHELESS FOR SUFFICENT REASON TO BE TREATED AS IF RESIDENT THEREIN OR WHO ARE LOCATED FOR THE TIME BEING WITHIN THAT PARISH. (B)IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR COSSINGTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVERNORS OF THAT SCHOOL AFTER CONSULTATION WITH THE SAID AUTHORITY. (C)IN ASSISTING PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF COSSINGTON WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE OCCUPATION OR SERVICE, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH OUTFITS, OR BY PAYING FEES, TRAVELLING OR MAINTENANCE EXPENSES, OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OR TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR LIVING AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. (D)IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF SUCH PERSONS. (E)IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED FOR USE AS AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY THE SAME FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL OR INDIVIDUAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID PARISH.
Area of benefit
COSSINGTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 MAIN STREET
COSSINGTON
LEICESTER
LE7 4UU
- Phone:
- 01509812271
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window