HUNT'S CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity operates within the Methodist Circuit in South Derbyshire. It's aim is to further the charitable purposes in connection with the Methodist Church in South Derbyshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 August 1963: Standard registration
- 22 October 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 22 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1133721 East Staffordshire and South Derbyshire Methodist ...
- HUNTS CHARITY (Working name)
- HUNT'S CHARITY FOR WESLEYAN SUPERNUMERARIES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.58k | £26.08k | £30.08k | £33.59k | £1.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 13TH OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE METHODIST CHURCH IN THE SOUTH DERBYSHIRE CIRCUIT.
Area of benefit
SOUTH DERBYSHIRE CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window