WALTER FARTHING (TRUST) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Charities in the Mid Essex area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 06 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Elizabeth Harper | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Patient | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ADAM COPSEY | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE SANDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHEA SUSAN TILSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
D J WISBEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
Francis Victor Whitbread | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.90k | £52.66k | £53.04k | £54.45k | £54.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.72k | £50.25k | £58.68k | £51.86k | £62.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH JULY 1957
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST AND TO HOLD OR APPLY THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COUNCIL OF MANAGEMENT OF THE TRUST MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
EDMUND CARR LLP
146 NEW LONDON ROAD
CHELMSFORD
CM2 0AW
- Phone:
- 01245 261818
- Email:
- contact@walterfarthing.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window