THE LENNOX TRUST COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objective is to grant donations for any charitable purposes, with an emphasis on support to organisations in the Sussex area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 April 1964: Standard registration
- THE EARL OF MARCHS TRUST COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE EARL OF MARCH'S TRUST COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lady Eloise Cordelia Gordon Lennox | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
J DUCHESS OF RICHMOND JANET DUCHESS OF RICHMOND | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
THE 11th Duke of Richmond | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | £2 | £129.80k | £76.00k | £6.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £11.19k | £18.06k | £150.33k | £29.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 298 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCATION DATED 4TH APRIL 1955
Charitable objects
1 TO SUBCRIBE TO ANY CHARITIES AND TO GRANT DONATIONS FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE.2 TO RELIEVE GRATUITOUSLY BY MEANS OF PECUNIARY OR OTHER ASSISTANCE NECESSITOUS PERSONS.2 TO PROMOTE THE POOR AND THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS BY SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL AGENCIES AND TO ESTABLISH CONDUCT AND CARRY ON NIGHT SHELTERS AND OTHER REFUGES FOR THE POOR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOODWOOD HOUSE
GOODWOOD
CHICHESTER
PO18 0PY
- Phone:
- 01243755000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window