THE HEAP-PARKINSON HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of housing for beneficiaries predominantly poor persons over the aged of 55 with a preference for poor spinsters or widows
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 06 August 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jillian Woollacott | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew Pickard | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Elmer | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Darren Shaw | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
CHRISTOPHER HARBRON | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Brian McDaid | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Ruth Annabel Heseltine | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
David Noland | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
William Stephen Morton | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Aidan David Higgins | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Virpi Kettunen | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Lewis Morgan | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||
WINSTON FEATHER | Trustee | 06 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
SHEILA BENTLEY | Trustee | 06 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
PETER MADELEY | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|||||||||
KAREN ANNE MCINTYRE | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|||||||||
ROBERT GEOFFREY HESELTINE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.63k | £33.90k | £38.08k | £46.94k | £46.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.84k | £15.21k | £11.49k | £15.32k | £9.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GOVERNED BY SCHEME OF 18TH JULY 2001 as amended on 06 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE; A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
URBAN PARISH OF SKIPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Skipton Town Council
Armoury House
45a Otley Street
Skipton
North Yorkshire
BD23 1EL
- Phone:
- 01756700553
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window