ST DAVID'S HOME FOR DISABLED SOLDIERS, SAILORS AND AIRMEN

Charity number: 220151
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St. David's Home provides 24 hour nursing care and rehabilitation services for disabled ex-Service personnel and their dependants. The Home is registered with the Care Quality Commission for 76 beds. Grant applications are made to benevolent associations and funds from voluntary sources are raised to supplement fee income. The Home also offers daily respite through its Day Care Centre service.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Ealing

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 1963: Standard registration
  • 08 September 1997: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 08 September 1997: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ST DAVIDS HOME (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £4.23m £4.39m £3.81m £3.90m £4.29m
Total expenditure £4.18m £4.61m £4.68m £4.55m £5.04m
Income from government contracts £931.50k £930.00k £758.00k £775.00k £911.57k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £171.81k £148.51k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £31.54k £149.26k £13.49k £11.55k £12.98k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.16m £4.21m £3.60m £3.76m £4.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.88k £11.53k £3.56k £1.29k £1.35k
Income - Other £31.18k £19.06k £198.88k £119.25k £14.48k
Income - Legacies £0 £143.94k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.18m £4.61m £4.68m £4.55m £5.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.60k £8.76k £8.70k £11.46k £33.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Own use assets £5.23m £5.05m £4.88m £4.73m £4.69m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.40m £2.37m £1.85m £1.44m £993.06k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £187.09k £188.93k £357.95k £447.09k £714.77k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 August 2024 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 August 2024 203 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 MAY 1932
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF ST. DAVID'S HOME OR FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR ANY OTHER HOME OR HOSPITAL SUBSTITUTED THEREFOR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 19 June 1963 : Standard registration
  • 08 September 1997 : Removed
  • 08 September 1997 : Asset transfer out