ANNIE PAHUD ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 220155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVISION OF THREE ALMSHOUSES AT CHALK LANE, WITHERN FOR ELDERLY PERSONS LIVING ALONE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £15,079
Total expenditure: £4,791

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Terry Steele Chair 07 September 2023
None on record
Patrick Murray Purves Trustee 04 February 2025
EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
LOUTH AND DISTRICT HELP FOR HOMELESS
Received: On time
Gillian Mary Henderson-Blair Trustee 06 April 2024
None on record
Martin Clough Trustee 25 July 2015
None on record
John Michael Brookes Trustee 26 November 2014
None on record
PAMELA ANN PERKINS Trustee
None on record
MARY HOLMQUEST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.77k £9.75k £25.37k £35.23k £15.08k
Total expenditure £11.76k £9.43k £15.42k £8.07k £4.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 28 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 BROADBANK
LOUTH
LN11 0EW
Phone:
01507605385
Website:

No information available