HAMMERTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lambeth
Governance
- 12 December 1963: Standard registration
- HAMMERTON HALL (Working name)
- ST ANDREWS CHURCH HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRINGTON TOPPIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev Andrew Grant | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL CHIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 18TH AUGUST 1953
Charitable objects
FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES HAVING IN VIEW THE SPIRITUAL, INTELLECTUAL, MORAL, SOCIAL, OR BODILY WANTS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND RESIDING IN THE PARISH OF ST. ANDREW, STOCKWELL GREEN. AND IN PROMOTING RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANDREW, STOCKWELL GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window