PEOPLE'S THEATRE ARTS GROUP LIMITED

Charity Number: 220256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Activities pertaining to the operation of an Arts Group

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £313,740
Total expenditure: £266,735

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew John De'Ath Chair 29 October 2020
None on record
Megan Smith Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Sheila Cooper Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Kathleen Joy Worswick Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Timothy Paul Swinton Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Matthew David Hope Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Lesley Patricia Heckels-Thompson Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Sara-Jo Harrison Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
STEPHEN MURRAY APPLEBY Trustee 29 October 2020
NEWCASTLE PEOPLE'S THEATRE ARTS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr PHILIP MARTIN BRADLEY Trustee 17 October 2013
None on record
MR TONY CHILDS Trustee
NEWCASTLE PEOPLE'S THEATRE ARTS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
CATHERINE ELIZABETH HOPE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £620.18k £298.34k £129.96k £292.42k £313.74k
Total expenditure £379.17k £289.67k £206.43k £241.53k £266.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £38.18k £61.96k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £59.81k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £382.47k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £177.23k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £670 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £315.84k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £46.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £16.66k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 14 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 14 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 30 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 02 June 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 02 June 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 July 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 26 July 2021 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PEOPLE'S THEATRE
STEPHENSON ROAD
HEATON
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 5QF
Phone:
0191 275 9875