Accounts and annual returns THE ROYCE INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 220266
Charity reporting is overdue by 1641 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1641 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1641 days