Register of Charities - The Charity Commission EASON GRUAZ HOMES
Charity number: 206611-1
Linked charity
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1901, SCHEME SEALED 19TH FEBRUARY 1907 AND SCHEME SEALED 17TH JULY 1978, AND AS AMENDED BY COMMISSIONERS' SCHEME OF 25 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR PERSONS OF GOOD REPUTE OVER 40 YEARS OF AGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 17 June 1963: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.