MRS T H BROWN WELFARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust's main object is to operate Churchhill Hall as a community centre and also to assist and encourage member groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Halton
Governance
- 12 July 1963: Standard registration
- MRS T H BROWNS TRUST (CHURCHILL HALL) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNCILLOR STEFAN MICHAEL JOHN NELSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Ronald Platell | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
BERYL ARNOLD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLLR ELLEN CARGILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR SYD BROXTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £11.80k | £6.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2025 | 343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 April 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 April 2022 | 439 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD NOVEMBER 1961. WILL OF MRS. S. W. BROWN DATED 26TH MAY 1949.
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH A WELFARE CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OVER SIXTY YEARS OF AGE RESIDING IN RUNCORN.
Area of benefit
RUNCORN
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 BROOKFIELD AVENUE
RUNCORN
WA7 5QZ
- Phone:
- 01928770233
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window