ANGLO-ISRAEL ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organization of lectures on archaeology in Israel and the Levant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Israel
Governance
- 05 February 1964: Standard registration
- AIAS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Tessa Rajak | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Anthony Leon Philip Rabin | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROF HUGH GODFREY WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.83k | £18.37k | £12.59k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.67k | £13.75k | £12.72k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH NOVEMBER 1962, AMENDED 17TH NOVEMBER 1986, AS AMENDED ON THE 20TH JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE DEPARTMENT OF ARCHAEOLOGY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM AND TO FOSTER RELATIONS BETWEEN THAT DEPARTMENT AND THE ACADEMIC BODIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE PURPOSE OF FACILITATING THE EXCHANGE OF LECTURERS AND RESEARCH WORKERS AND STUDENTS IN ARCHAEOLOGY AND KINDRED SUBJECTS. 2. TO PROMOTE AND SPONSOR PROGRAMMES OF RESEARCH IN ARCHAEOLOGY AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL EXCAVATIONS IN ISRAEL OR OUTSIDE ISRAEL. 3. TO ESTABLISH SCHOLARSHIPS AND COLLECT BOOKS AND EQUIPMENT, AND THUS FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE DEPARTMENT OF ARCHAEOLOGY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM. 4. TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2nd Floor Supreme House
300 Regents Park Road
N3 2JX
- Phone:
- 0208 883 5853
- Email:
- anthony.rabin@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window