Trustees GREENODD AND PENNYBRIDGE INSTITUTE
Charity Number: 220389

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Nicholson Watson | Chair | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ben Thomas Cooper | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Brown | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Mary Lambert | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Henry Cooper | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Nelson | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Nelson | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Watson | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.