GOSLING'S HOMES FOR AGED WOMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides housing accommadation for ladies aged 50 or over of limited means
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,875 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 18 October 1963: Standard registration
- GOSLING HOUSE (Working name)
- MR GOSLING'S HOME FOR AGED WOMEN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Ann Norman | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edna Williamson | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Dumbleton | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Nicholas John Rayner | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT MICHAEL TWYDLE FCA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.18k | £28.22k | £35.60k | £27.98k | £27.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.34k | £23.57k | £29.29k | £31.54k | £34.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 January 2025 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 January 2025 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2023 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2023 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2022 | 358 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 July 2022 | 633 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES ("BENEFICIARIES" MEANS WIDOWS, SPINSTERS OR UNATTACHED LADIES WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 50 YEARS OF AGE. PREFERENCE SHALL GIVEN TO THOSE APPLICANTS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT DURING THE LAST 10 YEARS, OR WHO HAVE RELATIVES LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AT THE TIME OF THE APPLICATION); AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE ("RESIDENTS" MEAN THOSE BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY WHO LIVE IN THE HOMES).
Area of benefit
WATFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Whielden Street
AMERSHAM
Buckinghamshire
HP7 0HU
- Phone:
- 07889477852
- Email:
- roberttwydle@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window