THE NORA JOAN MARSHALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to assist Christians in promotion of the Christian faith through both word and action. Grants will predominantly be made to established Christian organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 October 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY ANNE MARSHALL | Trustee | 01 March 1999 |
|
|||
RICHARD WILLIAM JOHN MARSHALL | Trustee | 08 December 1988 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.37k | £31.83k | £32.59k | £33.65k | £25.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.80k | £32.13k | £46.34k | £31.87k | £44.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 JUNE 1962
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SETTLOR SHALL IN HER LIFETIME OR BY HER WILL OR ANY CODICIL THERETO DETERMINE, AND SUBJECT TO AND IN DEFAULT OF SUCH DETERMINATION FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 MANOR ROAD
WORTHING
BN11 4RU
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window