Governing document CHRISTIAN POLICE ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH SEPTEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED ON 29 JANUARY 2011 AS AMENDED ON 11/07/2015 AS AMENDED ON 20 APR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED ON 18 NOV 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONGST SERVING MEMBERS OF THE POLICE SERVICE. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND OF SICKNESS, AND THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SERVING OR RETIRED MEMBERS OF THE POLICE SERVICE. 3. TO PROMOTE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OF CRIME THROUGH SUPPORTING PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THE POLICE AND OTHER COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.