BURTON-MANDERFIELD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouse - provision of housing for elderly single people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 20 June 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN MARY FOREMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
TONI BAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA STOREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.69k | £70.09k | £67.81k | £72.31k | £80.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.58k | £62.90k | £63.70k | £64.90k | £47.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2024 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2024 | 255 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 4TH DECEMBER 1963.
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WIDOWS, WIDOWERS OR UNMARRIED PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER AND OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE. ANY SURPLUS INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM OR WITHIN A TWO MILE RADIUS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROTHERA BRAY SOLICITORS
2 KAYES WALK
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 1PZ
- Phone:
- 01159100600
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window