ALLESTREE EVERGREEN CLUB

Charity number: 220557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintains premises where people over 50 years of age in the local community can enjoy activities such as dancing, snooker, whist and other card games for a small subscription currently ú4 pa as from 1-8-07. Organises outings for members to local places of interest or entertainment. Rent out the premises to other local groups with such varied activities as dancing, yoga, health and fitness, gardeni

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £28,027
Total expenditure: £18,003

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ALLESTREE OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Richard Young Chair 04 July 2021
CAMTAD HEARING SUPPORT
Received: On time
Brian David Baxter Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Robert Gerrard Trustee 31 August 2024
None on record
Ann Kerry Trustee 31 August 2023
None on record
Phillip Duesbury Trustee 04 February 2022
None on record
Karen Geraghty Trustee 04 February 2022
None on record
Dave Simpson Trustee 04 February 2022
None on record
Eileen Young Trustee 04 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £18.97k £19.41k £13.57k £21.65k £28.03k
Total expenditure £33.83k £6.74k £15.92k £19.89k £18.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 06 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 18/07/1959
Charitable objects
HALL FOR THE RELIEF OF THE AGED IN THE PARISH OF ALLESTREE AND FOR SUCH OTHER OF THE OBJECTS, FOR WHICH THE COMMITTEE IS FOR THE TIME BEING ESTABLISHED, AS ARE LEGALLY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ALLESTREE
Registration history
  • 06 April 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Evergreen Club
Cornhill
Allestree
DERBY
DE22 2FT
Phone:
01332558144
Website:

No information available