Financial history Friends of Eastbourne Hospital

Charity number: 220592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £773.60k £741.32k £792.74k £786.67k £2.26m
Total expenditure £763.16k £537.83k £1.15m £792.85k £818.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £345.98k £392.18k £322.52k £193.58k £1.57m
Income - Other trading activities £425.75k £349.03k £420.91k £588.98k £48.52k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £48.69k £0 £620.42k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.87k £107 £629 £4.11k £20.11k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.50k
Income - Legacies £205.66k £324.28k £181.70k £118.31k £1.53m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £437.87k £265.75k £793.18k £363.05k £340.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds £325.30k £272.08k £355.74k £429.79k £478.73k
Expenditure - Governance £12.85k £11.26k £12.49k £10.47k £15.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £357.39k £226.04k £733.87k £311.43k £260.95k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0