Governing document Friends of Eastbourne Hospital

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 07/11/1984 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/1990 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/1992 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2013 AS AMENDED ON 30 NOV 2016 as amended on 11 Dec 2019 as amended on 21 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO RAISE VOLUNTARY FUNDS TO PROVIDE EXTRA AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE PATIENTS AND STAFF OF ALL THE HOSPITALS UNDER THE CONTROL OF THE EASTBOURNE HOSPITAL NHS TRUST AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO PROVIDE SUCH AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE PATIENTS AND STAFF OF OTHER ESTABLISHMENTS WHICH USUALLY ACCOMMODATE OR FOR THE TIME BEING ARE ACCOMMODATING PATIENTS WHO NORMALLY RESIDE IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE EASTBOURNE HOSPITAL NHS TRUST. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUION)
Area of benefit
EASTBOURNE HOSPITAL GROUP
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.