Trustees Friends of Eastbourne Hospital
Charity number: 220592

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANTHONY WALMSLEY | Chair | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Grace | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Eileen Henson | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glendon Stentiford Stone | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trisha Hamblin | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Lock | Trustee | 05 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS SANDY BOYCE-SHARPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUGH PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN CAFFYN MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY CAMERON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOZENCA PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.