Accounts and annual returns KETTLETHORPE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 220635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 25 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 27 September 2022 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 02 October 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 14 September 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required