Accounts and annual returns BRIDGE ESTATE

Charity number: 220716
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 February 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 February 2024 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window